Financial history LIGHTYEAR FOUNDATION LTD

Charity number: 1150231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £95.42k £105.09k £107.73k £158.62k £230.33k
Total expenditure £88.59k £83.04k £91.45k £71.74k £127.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.53k N/A N/A N/A N/A