LIGHTYEAR FOUNDATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education in science amongst schoolchildren and adults in the UK, including by: - breaking down barriers to help disabled children and young adults participate in STEM - organising events which promote an interest in science - investigating and using new technology to communicate scientific knowledge and understanding
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 December 2012: Standard registration
- LIGHTYEAR FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Maria Camila Devis-Rozental DProf | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Josie Rawes | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive Gilbert | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirshen Govender | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Jane Williams | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter James John Roberts | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Camilla Sih Mai Pang | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.42k | £105.09k | £107.73k | £158.62k | £230.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.59k | £83.04k | £91.45k | £71.74k | £127.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/07/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SCIENCE AMONGST SCHOOLCHILDREN AND ADULTS IN THE UK AND ABROAD IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING BY: -HELPING ESTABLISH SCIENCE-ORIENTED PARTNERSHIPS BETWEEN SCHOOLS IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS -ORGANISING EVENTS WHICH PROMOTE AN INTEREST IN SCIENCE -INVESTIGATING AND USING NEW TECHNOLOGY TO COMMUNICATE SCIENTIFIC KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Anson Drive
YORK
YO10 4LH
- Phone:
- 07545899729
- Email:
- Info@lightyearfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window