SUDBURY EPHEMERA ARCHIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SEA meets twice a month to catalogue and preserve papers, e.g invoices tickets, programmes,and photographs, portraying the town's social history. Using the website, public events, reports in local press and radio, donations of ephemera are invited and the its use as a research facility. SEA aims to save ephemera and oral memories relating to the relocation of population from London in 1960's.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 20 February 2013: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FIONA MARGARET WHEELER | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Christopher Rupert Starr | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hyndman | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Gilbert | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Minter | Trustee | 07 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Tibbetts | Trustee | 07 July 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £783 | £0 | £90 | £1.24k | £404 | |
|
Total expenditure | £525 | £295 | £243 | £688 | £446 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 NOV 2012
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ACQUIRING, CONSERVING, CATALOGUING, INTERPRETING, RESEARCHING INTO AND DISPLAYING ANY PAPERS, DOCUMENTS, RECORDS AND OTHER ITEMS IN ANY AND EVERY MEDIUM AND OF ANY AND EVERY KIND RELATING DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY HOWSOEVER TO THE HISTORY OF SUDBURY, SUFFOLK AND DISTRICT AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THAT GENERALITY) THOSE OF AN EPHEMERAL NATURE IN ALL RESPECTS EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY IN ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RIVER HOUSE
THE CROFT
SUDBURY
CO10 1HW
- Phone:
- 01787370856
- Email:
- contact@sudburyephemera.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window