Financial history BIBLE TRUST

Charity number: 1151179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £42.49k £37.09k £116.59k £54.88k £53.95k
Total expenditure £30.96k £46.64k £74.18k £83.60k £26.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A