Accounts and annual returns JAPAN MATSURI

Charity number: 1150911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 23 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 23 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 05 March 2024 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 22 February 2023 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 05 July 2022 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 05 July 2022 189 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 25 February 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 25 February 2021 58 days late Download Open in new window