JAPAN MATSURI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To hold Japan Matsuri (Japan Festival) at Trafalgar Square, London in September or October. About 50,000 people attend the event. To engage in planting of cherry trees at locations throughout UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 February 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEISAKU SANO | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hiroshi Kobayashi | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
THE JAPAN SOCIETY | Trustee | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Japanese Chamber of Commerce & Industry in the UK | Trustee | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JAPAN ASSOCIATION IN THE UK | Trustee | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £589.05k | £33.54k | £700 | £10.00k | £166.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £284.09k | £137.66k | £150.82k | £32.96k | £203.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £434.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £154.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £284.09k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 05 July 2022 | 189 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 05 July 2022 | 189 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 FEB 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/02/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO PROMOTE AND DISSEMINATE THE UNDERSTANDING OF JAPANESE CULTURE TO THE PUBLIC THROUGH VARIOUS EVENTS AND ACTIVITIES, (2) TO PROMOTE LEARNING AND ADVANCE ALL FORMS OF EDUCATION RELATING TO JAPAN,
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 80
Clarence Gate Gardens
Glentworth Street
London
NW1 6QR
- Phone:
- 02076280069
- Email:
- chamber@jcci.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window