FRIENDS OF ALDERMAN JACOBS SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school. Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 21 January 2013: Standard registration
- FOAJS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lyndsey Frickleton | Chair | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marisa Overend | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kristina Mills | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/01/2020 | 15/01/2021 | 15/01/2022 | 15/01/2023 | 15/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.07k | £7.69k | £8.41k | £9.17k | £3.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.82k | £2.51k | £11.44k | £9.53k | £7.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 January 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 January 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 January 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 January 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 January 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/01/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALDERMAN JACOBS SCHOOL
DRYBREAD ROAD
WHITTLESEY
PETERBOROUGH
PE7 1XJ
- Phone:
- 01733202403
- Email:
- friendsofajs@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window