ANGEL NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Free School, Training, Advocacy, Promote Socially Excluded Communities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambodia
- Laos
- Vietnam
Governance
- 21 December 2012: Standard registration
- 27 June 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2013 | 24 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 SEP 2012 AS AMENDED ON 19/12/2012
Charitable objects
OBJECT : THE ALLEVIATION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS TO THOSE IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES BY: THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT FOR SUCH PERSONS, WITH THE PURPOSE OF DEVELOPING SKILLS TO ENABLE THEM TO IMPROVE THEIR STANDARD OF LIVING INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) INCOME, HEALTH AND LITERACY AND TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEIR ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window