TAKING GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The furtherance of the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 December 2012: Standard registration
- SALT & LIGHT NORTH EAST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL STEPHEN STRIKE | Chair | 03 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Steven Anthony McFarlane | Trustee | 12 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Matthew Stuart Biddlecombe | Trustee | 12 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neville Wright | Trustee | 12 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ANDREW DUNKLEY | Trustee | 03 December 2012 |
|
|||||
JEREMY GOULDING | Trustee | 03 December 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.37k | £145.35k | £152.44k | £162.53k | £144.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.05k | £128.58k | £122.37k | £140.72k | £181.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £214 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 August 2022 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 August 2022 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS'("THE OBJECTS")ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ATTACHED IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND AND SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Oakwood Centre
1 CLEASBY WAY
DURHAM LANE INDUSTRIAL PARK
EAGLESCLIFFE
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
TS16 0RD
- Phone:
- 01642781919
- Email:
- paul.bale@tvcchurch.org.uk
- Website:
-
WWW.TAKINGGROUND.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window