AFGHAN WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Afghan Welfare Trust support orphan's families in Afghanistan, started supporting families in Ningarhar Provence Jalalabad city.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 September 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Hounslow
Governance
- 29 July 2013: Standard registration
- ORPHANS CARE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDUL GHAFOOR | Trustee | 14 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL QAHIR TURGUL | Trustee | 14 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/09/2017 | 20/09/2018 | 20/09/2019 | 20/09/2020 | 20/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.26k | £1.42k | £3.54k | £5.72k | £1.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £6.39k | £12.49k | £1.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 284 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 284 days | |
Annual return | 20 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 650 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 650 days | |
Annual return | 20 September 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 September 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 259 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 September 2019 | 10 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/08/2011 AS AMENDED ON 28/06/2013
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST CHILDREN IN NEED IN AFGHANISTAN IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO ORPHANS BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO ATTEND SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Liscombe Road
Dunstable
LU5 4PL
- Phone:
- 07958454901
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window