THE METHODIST HOMESTEAD

Charity number: 1150018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Methodist Homestead provides warm, manageable, comfortable and secure homes for our Residents in a caring Christian environment in keeping with the needs of our Residents, primarily for: a) members of Methodist Churches in the Northampton Circuit; b) retired Methodist Ministers and their spouses; c) elderly persons of limited means who are practising Christians of any denomination.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £177,827
Total expenditure: £179,629

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 May 1968: Standard registration
  • 06 September 2013: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • HOMESTEAD COTTAGES (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN EDMONDS Chair 30 May 2013
DELAPRE ABBEY PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
THE LOWDOWN
Received: On time
Heather DAVIES Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
CAROL JOY BALDWIN Trustee 16 November 2021
None on record
JONATHAN ANDREW SMITH Trustee 25 August 2020
None on record
Elizabeth Ruth McAteer Trustee 13 November 2018
None on record
ANDREW MICHAEL ROBINSON Trustee 21 February 2017
None on record
SUSAN DORMAN Trustee 30 May 2013
None on record
KATHERINE ELIZABETH BROWN Trustee 30 May 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £146.68k £139.68k £136.26k £158.00k £177.83k
Total expenditure £93.80k £84.18k £124.03k £114.24k £179.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £200

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 05 November 2022 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 17/06/1971 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14/01/1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30/08/2013
Charitable objects
INCOME: INCOME TO BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE AND ADMINISTRATION OF THE CHARITIES PROPERTY AND SUBJECT THERETO FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE CHARITY ALMSHOUSES: TWO OF THE ALMSHOUSES BELONGING TO THE CHARITY ARE USED FOR THE RESIDENCE AND BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS WHO SHALL BE SUPERANNUATED MINISTERS OF THE METHODIST CHURCH WHO ARE OF LIMITED MEANS AND THEIR WIFES. IF ON THE OCCASION OF A VACANCY THERE ARE NO SUITABLE APPLICANTS,THEN A PERSON HAVING THE QUALIFICATIONS OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE OTHER ALMSHOUSES MAY BE APPOINTED. OTHER ALMSHOUSES ARE USED FOR THE RESIDENCE OF RESIDENTS WHO SHALL BE PERSONS WHO ARE ADVANCED IN YEARS AND OF LIMITED MEANS BELONGING TO OR CONNECTED WITH ANY OF THE METHODIST CHURCHES IN THE NORTHAMPTON CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTON METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Registration history
  • 08 May 1968 : Standard registration
  • 06 September 2013 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
14 METHODIST HOMESTEAD
HOMESTEAD WAY
NORTHAMPTON
NN2 6JH
Phone:
07967623026