NORTHEAST ASIA FOUNDATION FOR EDUCATION AND CULTURE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education and health and relief of poverty and care for orphans in the Northeast of Asia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- China
- North Korea
Governance
- 05 July 2013: Standard registration
- 27 May 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NAFEC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.92k | £17.69k | £9.47k | £8.21k | £6.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.39k | £14.53k | £12.27k | £10.11k | £6.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 28 August 2019 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/02/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08/02/2013
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL AND OTHER ASSISTANCE TO NON-PROFIT MAKING EDUCATIONAL AND CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, INCLUDING UNIVERSITIES AND ORPHANAGES, IN NORTH-EAST ASIA.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window