PENDLEBURY EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity Number: 1150273
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The primary objectives of the charity are to proclaim the Gospel of Jesus Christ and to provide and maintain the build through which this may be achieved. All activities, both of a specifically spiritual nature, have taken place in accordance with the Statement of Beliefs (Doctrines and Practices) as included in the Memorandum and Articles of Association

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 December 2012: Standard registration
  • 12 August 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 12 August 2024: Funds transferred to 1118251 KINGS PEOPLE'S CHURCH
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £67.42k £0 £220 £0 £0
Total expenditure £55.10k £9.24k £414.32k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 December 2023 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 November 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 December 2020 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required