Financial history EAST BEDLINGTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1150904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £79.89k £58.50k £73.63k £61.97k £56.29k
Total expenditure £125.30k £95.89k £110.63k £92.03k £131.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £40.14k N/A £10.96k £10.57k