Trustees EAST BEDLINGTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1150904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Wilczek Trustee 10 December 2024
None on record
Keith Grimes Trustee 05 May 2024
None on record
Jacqueline Wilson Trustee 06 September 2023
None on record
Keith Scantlebury Trustee 02 May 2023
None on record
Leonard Smith Trustee 20 February 2019
None on record
RONALD JAMES THORNTON Trustee 02 July 2012
None on record
JENNIFER ANNE TINDALE Trustee 02 July 2012
None on record
RONALD STRAUGHAN Trustee 02 July 2012
None on record