Trustees WOMEN ON THE FRONTLINE MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1150842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHARLENE ANDERSON Chair 10 August 2021
WOMEN ON THE FRONTLINE MINISTRIES
Recently registered
Aicha Ouattara Trustee 24 September 2024
WOMEN ON THE FRONTLINE MINISTRIES
Recently registered
Lawunmi Nwaiwu Trustee 22 July 2024
WOMEN ON THE FRONTLINE MINISTRIES
Recently registered
Zarrin Holland Trustee 26 October 2022
WOMEN ON THE FRONTLINE MINISTRIES
Recently registered
Rupal Chauhan Trustee 28 June 2022
WOMEN ON THE FRONTLINE MINISTRIES
Recently registered
Karen Burnett Trustee 24 January 2018
WOMEN ON THE FRONTLINE MINISTRIES
Recently registered
Tanya Hughes OBE Trustee 11 December 2012
WOMEN ON THE FRONTLINE MINISTRIES
Recently registered
PRISON RADIO ASSOCIATION
Received: On time