ABBOTS BROMLEY HOSPITAL

Charity Number: 1150207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of accommodation for those in need in the local area

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £42,103
Total expenditure: £17,814

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 December 2012: Standard registration
  • 27 April 2020: Funds received from 242796 ABBOTS BROMLEY HOSPITAL
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHARLES JAMES BAGOT JEWITT Chair 14 December 2012
Community Foundation for Staffordshire and Shropshire
Received: On time
Catherine Brown Trustee 27 January 2021
None on record
Rachel Chapman Trustee 04 February 2019
None on record
Georgina Kelly Trustee 17 November 2015
None on record
REVEREND SIMON CHARLES DAVIS Trustee 14 December 2012
MARIA HARRIET LOWE
Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days
COLTON PARISH LANDS
Received: On time
PARISH CLERK'S CHARITY
Received: On time
MRS MITHRA TONKING Trustee 14 December 2012
THE WILLIAM SALT LIBRARY TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £38.60k £126.64k £38.92k £42.10k £42.10k
Total expenditure £34.27k £170.72k £21.14k £17.81k £17.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £70.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 02 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 12 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Abbots Bromley Hospital Office
Bagots Street
Abbots Bromley
Staffordshire
WS15 3BZ
Phone:
07966 637044
Website:

No information available