GLOBAL FUSION MUSIC & ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Music events, festivals, theatre, community and schools workshops, art exhibitions, poetry, writing group, publishing, audio production, graphic design, photography, film making and project management. We have worked closely with many: schools, local authorities, housing associations, to showcase high quality World Music and Arts. GFMA provide free workshops in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £8,836 from 2 government contract(s) and £6,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 July 2013: Standard registration
- GFMA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Dennis Jun-Yu Low | Chair | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Farida Affalouad | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pearl Mendes | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Alayo | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bina Arvind Brown | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ebenezer Olusegun Oke | Trustee | 16 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Mann | Trustee | 22 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Edmund Claude Deppa | Trustee | 22 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
GASTERVOUS KATUMBA | Trustee | 19 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
ARMARDIP SAINI | Trustee | 19 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARY SWAN | Trustee | 19 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.08k | £40.41k | £56.63k | £92.23k | £64.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.33k | £33.26k | £56.84k | £93.92k | £60.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £10.53k | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | £8.84k | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.50k | £3.50k | £19.99k | £42.29k | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2022
(These accounts |
25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 June 2021 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/06/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF MUSIC AND ARTS IN ALL ITS FORMS AND WITHIN THIS PROMOTING A KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF MUSIC AND ARTS. 2. TO PROMOTE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ARTS OF MUSIC, DRAMA, DANCE AND POETRY 3. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS;
Contact information
- Address:
-
GFMA Community Office
Ground Floor
Valiant Hous e
Valley Grove
London
SE7 7RP
- Phone:
- 02031490343
- Email:
- info@globalfusionarts.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window