Trustees GLOBAL FUSION MUSIC & ARTS
Charity number: 1152721

Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Dennis Jun-Yu Low | Chair | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Farida Affalouad | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pearl Mendes | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Alayo | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bina Arvind Brown | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ebenezer Olusegun Oke | Trustee | 16 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Mann | Trustee | 22 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Edmund Claude Deppa | Trustee | 22 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
GASTERVOUS KATUMBA | Trustee | 19 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
ARMARDIP SAINI | Trustee | 19 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARY SWAN | Trustee | 19 December 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.