LEEDS TRINITY STUDENTS UNION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the interest and welfare of students at Leeds Trinity University by representing, supporting and advising students. To be the recognised representative between students and Leeds Trinity University and other external bodies. To provide social, cultural, sporting and recreational activities and forums for discussions and debate to allow for personal development of students.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leeds City
Governance
- 09 April 2013: Standard registration
- 08 January 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 08 January 2020: Funds transferred to 1184182 LEEDS TRINITY STUDENTS UNION
- LTSU (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £344.33k | £401.09k | £336.19k | £317.83k | £301.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £335.59k | £417.28k | £336.46k | £363.38k | £300.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 18 March 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | 18 March 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 27 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | 27 March 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 17 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | 17 February 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEP 2011
Charitable objects
1. TO ACT AS A MEDIUM OF COMMUNICATION BETWEEN THE MEMBERS OF THE UNION, THE GOVERNORS, THE COLLEGE AND OTHER BODIES. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ITS MEMBERS AND STUDENTS OF THE COLLEGE AS A WHOLE. 3. TO REPRESENT THE INTEREST OF ITS MEMBERS AND ACT AS A CHANNEL OF COMMUNICATION IN DEALING WITH THE COLLEGE AND OTHER BODIES. 4. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE WELFARE OF ITS MEMBERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND ACTIVITIES. 5. TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND CO-ORDINATE STUDENT CLUBS, SOCIETIES, SPORTS AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window