Financial history CAPEHILL MUSLIM SOCIETY

Charity number: 1151422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £92.65k £60.84k £65.59k £64.50k £91.41k
Total expenditure £49.99k £38.80k £20.06k £21.25k £37.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.97k N/A N/A N/A