Financial history TADLEY & DISTRICT U3A

Charity Number: 1150232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.68k £9.79k £438 £22.16k £28.66k
Total expenditure £17.52k £5.02k £12.25k £23.10k £26.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A