Trustees TADLEY & DISTRICT U3A
Charity Number: 1150232

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Howard Imms | Trustee | 18 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gail Marion Biggs | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hadassah Davis | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Esme Carter | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Geater | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN SHARPE | Trustee | 11 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
MRS CAROL PHIIPPS | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS JACKI CASSIDY | Trustee | 16 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
COLIN RALPH HEWITT | Trustee | 16 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR MIKE BATSON | Trustee | 16 December 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.