Governing document WYTHENSHAWE COMMUNITY HOUSING GROUP LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 APR 2016 as amended on 26 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE: THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISABILITY AND FOR THE AGED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL HOUSING AND AFFORDABLE AND / OR SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED HOUSING AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES AND AMENITIES; THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES, IN PARTICULAR THE REGISTERED CHARITIES PARKWAY GREEN HOUSING TRUST (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER: 1116258) AND WILLOW PARK HOUSING TRUST (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER: 1074481), PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADMINISTRATIVE, HUMAN RESOURCES, INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY AND DEVELOPMENT SUPPORT AND PROPERTY MANAGEMENT AND MAINTENANCE; THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING (PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE) AND PROVIDING PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; TO PROVIDE, OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, IN THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OR ANY OTHER GROUP ORGANISATIONS OWN OR MANAGE PROPERTY; AND SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND WHICH ARE NOT PROHIBITED FROM TIME TO TIME FOR A COMPANY REGISTERED AS A PROVIDER OF SOCIAL HOUSING WITH THE REGULATOR UNDER THE 2008 ACT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.