Accounts and annual returns NKG INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1151227
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 09 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 09 September 2024 345 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 24 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 24 July 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2020 21 March 2022 172 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 21 March 2022 172 days late
Annual return 30 November 2019 27 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 27 August 2020 On Time