Financial history THE MY HOME LIFE ESSEX COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1153084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £74.35k £52.41k £87.24k £174.34k £103.89k
Total expenditure £64.19k £51.30k £53.93k £71.61k £82.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £40.46k £46.30k £153.45k N/A