THE MY HOME LIFE ESSEX COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help older people predominantly living in care homes to enjoy the best possible quality of life through meaningful engagement with friends and neighbours (FaNs) in their surrounding community. Our FaNs initiatives include the Wishing Washing Line, Intergenerational Colchester Up, Young FaNs Club, FaNimals and Care Home Bake-Off.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
- Thurrock
Governance
- 26 July 2013: Standard registration
- MHLECA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Paul Smith | Chair | 19 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Ben Wheat | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philip Poulter | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karon Elizabeth Gush | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Joanne Clarke | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Ann Carpenter | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.35k | £52.41k | £87.24k | £174.34k | £103.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.19k | £51.30k | £53.93k | £71.61k | £82.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £40.46k | £46.30k | £153.45k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT BY HELPING OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AS A RESULT OF THEIR PHYSICAL AND/OR MENTAL DISABILITIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE LIVING IN RESIDENTIAL CARE SETTINGS IN ESSEX, TO ENGAGE MEANINGFULLY AND RE-INTEGRATE AS FULLY AS POSSIBLE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: A) PROMOTING, INCREASING OR CO-ORDINATING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THESE OLDER PEOPLE TO ENGAGE WITH INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS IN THEIR WIDER COMMUNITIES ACCORDING TO THEIR NEEDS, INTERESTS AND PREFERENCES, AND TO ENABLE THEM TO MAKE THEIR OWN CONTRIBUTIONS TO THEIR WIDER COMMUNITIES IF THEY SO WISH. B) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE WORK AND DAY TO DAY LIFE FOR OLDER PEOPLE WITHIN RESIDENTIAL CARE SETTINGS AND THE NEEDS OF THE RESIDENTS TO ENCOURAGE VOLUNTEERING AND ENABLE THESE RESIDENTS IN PRACTICAL WAYS TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY. C) RECRUITING, TRAINING AND SUPPORTING VOLUNTEERS TO BEFRIEND AND SUPPORT OLDER PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EDMUND CARR LLP
146 NEW LONDON ROAD
CHELMSFORD
CM2 0AW
- Phone:
- 07583 535127
- Email:
- info@MHLEC.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window