THE SERVICE OFFICE OF FAMILIES ANONYMOUS (UK, EIRE AND GIBRALTAR) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary activity of the Charity, t/a Families Anonymous, is the support of families and friends of drug abusers in the UK, Eire and Gibraltar. This is achieved by supplying and answering enquiries on Public Information, a 7 days a week Helpline, the FA Website including Forum, an annual convention and the sale of FA Literature. FA support groups are throughout the UK and Gibraltar, and Eire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 April 2013: Standard registration
- FA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon O'Mahony | Chair | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Weston | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jan Stuart | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sha Saumtally | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justine Gillings | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Brown | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WHEATLEY | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Harding | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Lamb | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Beck | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roy Davis | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jemma Spelman | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.28k | £11.35k | £13.51k | £13.24k | £23.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.14k | £9.11k | £11.29k | £13.63k | £17.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 APR 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND PREVENT DISTRESS, AND POVERTY, AMONG FAMILIES AND DEPENDENTS OF PERSONS WHO HAVE BEHAVIOURAL PROBLEMS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AS A RESULT OF THE ABUSE OF DRUGS, PARTICULARLY MIND-ALTERING SUBSTANCES, BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit F19
The Old Convent
Beeches Green
Stroud
Gloucestershire
GL5 4AD
- Phone:
- 02074984680
- Email:
- office@famanon.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window