Trustees THE SERVICE OFFICE OF FAMILIES ANONYMOUS (UK, EIRE AND GIBRALTAR) LIMITED
Charity number: 1151750

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon O'Mahony | Chair | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jan Stuart | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sha Saumtally | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justine Gillings | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Brown | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WHEATLEY | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Harding | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Lamb | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Beck | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roy Davis | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jemma Spelman | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.