Financial history Trauma Breakthrough Ltd.

Charity Number: 1150508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £50.55k £157.01k £199.65k £207.07k £281.63k
Total expenditure £50.83k £87.69k £164.89k £225.00k £260.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £40.90k N/A