WARRINGTON INTEGRATED SPORTS CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide sporting activities. Swimming, football, boccia, table tennis, carpet bowls, pool/snooker, board games eg draughts/dominoes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Warrington
- Wirral
Governance
- 29 September 1975: Standard registration
- 21 August 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- WARRINGTON AND DISTRICT SPORTS AND RECREATION CLUB FOR THE DISABLED (Previous name)
- WARRINGTON SPORTS AND RECREATION CLUB FOR THE DISABLED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.74k | £1.68k | £989 | £9.96k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.57k | £3.12k | £1.19k | £10.23k | £240 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 06 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 MARCH 1975 AS AMENDED 1ST JULY 1992.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE DISABLED, BY THE PROMOTION OF AN ENCOURAGEMENT OF ACTIVE SPORTS AMONG SUCH DISABLED PERSONS AND BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND OTHER VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION.
Area of benefit
WARRINGTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window