THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST SHEPPEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Christian worship at our parish churches, including new service for the local care homes, chaplaincyand services in our local hospital Pastoral care for people living in the parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 27 February 2013: Previously excepted registration
- WEST SHEPPEY PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patrick Van Lind | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jane Pollard | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Austin-Williamson | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Stephen Reveley | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Cummings | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Germaney | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Cummings | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Hale | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Jon Smith | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Mary Prior | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Shiel | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY ROBERT PLATT | Trustee | 27 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROWENA SQUIRE | Trustee | 18 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GILBERT CCHEM MRSC | Trustee | 18 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA SMITH | Trustee | 18 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIE AMANDA PALMER | Trustee | 18 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH SHOEBRIDGE | Trustee | 18 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.01k | £67.01k | £187.64k | £215.88k | £140.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.48k | £73.08k | £185.56k | £179.99k | £112.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Minster Parish Office
Vicarage Road
Minster On Sea
SHEERNESS
Kent
ME12 2HE
- Phone:
- 01795871500
- Email:
- office@minsterabbey.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window