Financial history APOSTOLIC FAITH MISSION INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES SLOUGH ASSEMBLY

Charity number: 1153480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £45.95k £80.87k £40.74k £55.66k £73.81k
Total expenditure £85.72k £45.78k £66.61k £69.22k £71.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A