RELATIONAL MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AS WELL AS ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Canada
- Czech Republic
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- India
- Iraq
- Kenya
- Latvia
- Netherlands
- Poland
- Romania
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Spain
- Sweden
- Taiwan
- Ukraine
- United States
Governance
- 24 January 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN RICHARD BEARDON | Chair | 20 December 2012 |
|
|||||||||
Robert William Souster | Trustee | 27 July 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Elizabeth Joy Rogers | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Ruth Oyeniyi | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||
ROBERT TIMOTHY WILLIAMS | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|||||||||
John Stuart Jones | Trustee | 11 December 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £487.42k | £643.70k | £489.15k | £285.21k | £314.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £567.92k | £528.58k | £508.50k | £317.38k | £311.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £583.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £59.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £528.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 DEC 2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 3.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; 3.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND 3.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jubilee Family Centre
Norwich Road
Aylsham
NORWICH
NR11 6JG
- Phone:
- 08454680270
- Email:
- admin@relationalmission.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window