MUSLIM FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH BY THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTE TO SERVE MUSLIM AND NON MUSLIMS. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO THE POOR AND NEEDY AROUND THE WORLD. TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY AND IN OTHER PARTS OF THE UK OR THE WORLD AS DEEMED FIT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
- India
- Malawi
- Pakistan
Governance
- 21 January 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Syed Hussain | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ajaz Bhatti | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zaheer Hussain | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.77k | £34.45k | £42.33k | £38.66k | £51.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.58k | £28.74k | £42.07k | £40.21k | £37.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 20 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 20 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 NOV 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY('THE OBJECTS')ARE: (A)TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH BY THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTE TO SERVE MUSLIM AND NON MUSLIMS ALIKE. (B)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO THE POOR AND NEEDY AROUND THE WORLD. (C)TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Gladstone Street
Basford
Nottingham
NG7 6GA
- Phone:
- 07534895338
- Email:
- JamiMasjidMuslim@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window