SIGNAL FILM & MEDIA LIMITED

Charity number: 1152012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

a) Providing a centre for arts and creative industries where local residents, particularly those from disadvantaged groups, can access facilities and activities to develop skills in a diverse range of creative, media and arts disciplines b) Providing premises, space and activities for local front-line groups, to support media production and the creative and artistic development of local people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 May 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SIGNAL FILM & MEDIA LIMITED (Working name)
  • SIGNAL FILM & MEDIA (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Margaret Davis Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Jemma Swales Trustee 11 December 2020
None on record
David Foster Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
Natalia Wealleans-Turner Trustee 23 September 2020
FURNESS MULTI-CULTURAL COMMUNITY FORUM
Received: On time
Brie Burkeman Trustee 15 April 2019
None on record
Helen Wall Trustee 15 April 2019
None on record
KERRY KOLBE Trustee 09 November 2018
CREATIVE STUDIOS CUMBRIA
Received: On time
Chris Barnes Trustee 09 April 2014
None on record
KAREN MARGARET BIRD Trustee 30 January 2013
None on record
Loren Slater Trustee 30 May 2008
CREATIVE STUDIOS CUMBRIA
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £433.64k £502.29k £492.29k £444.75k £700.77k
Total expenditure £325.59k £350.42k £518.03k £521.59k £562.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £28.00k £5.33k N/A £10.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £502.25k N/A N/A £698.67k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £49 N/A N/A £2.10k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £344.32k N/A N/A £532.54k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A £30.00k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £2.02k N/A N/A £4.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £6.10k N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets N/A £10.53k N/A N/A £68.99k
Long-term investments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A £313.31k N/A N/A £333.14k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A £35.29k N/A N/A £77.93k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Signal Film & Media
104 Abbey Road
Barrow-in-Furness
LA14 5QR
Phone:
01229838592