Financial history THE SOCIETY OF JEWELLERY HISTORIANS

Charity Number: 1151393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £24.39k £112.37k £40.11k £37.02k £38.89k
Total expenditure £14.32k £13.36k £25.26k £31.30k £31.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A