Trustees THE SOCIETY OF JEWELLERY HISTORIANS
Charity number: 1151393

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHERINE FRANCOISE PURCELL | Chair | 03 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT EUSTACE WALTER LEIGH-PEMBERTON | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Rothwell | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Susan Topping | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucina Emily Orr Ms | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aude Mongiatti | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Beatriz Sampson | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Forsyth | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr NIAMH WHITFIELD | Trustee | 16 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD RICHARD PEARCE EDGCUMBE | Trustee | 16 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANE PERRY | Trustee | 16 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN CERRONE | Trustee | 16 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr LYNNE BARTLETT PHD | Trustee | 16 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Judith Ann Rudoe | Trustee | 23 June 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.