BARNES COMMUNITY ARTS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, maintain, improve and advance education and appreciation of the arts in all forms among the people of Barnes and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £900 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 01 February 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Carruthers | Chair | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Andrews | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Johnston | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Downes | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenni Young | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Edward Jack Rycroft | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Coussins | Trustee | 28 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIMON DANCIGER | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £372.36k | £382.91k | £482.01k | £491.37k | £478.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £290.37k | £371.88k | £459.76k | £558.24k | £479.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £1.34k | £9.69k | £900 | |
|
Income from government grants | £97.11k | £132.09k | £55.13k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 February 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 February 2023 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 Feb 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS IN ALL FORMS AMONG THE PEOPLE OF BARNES AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
RICHMOND UPON THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 STATION ROAD
BARNES
LONDON
SW13 0LF
- Phone:
- 02088769885
- Email:
- trustees@osoarts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window