MV DERBYSHIRE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To erect a stone memorial at the Liverpool Parish church to commemorate the people who died in the Mv "Derbyshire" and to support the Merseyside Maritime Museum in presenting exhibitions that educate the public to the difference between the dangers faced by the seafarer in the context of the natural environment, and those posed by the inadequacy of the means by which he/she plies the oceans.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Liverpool City
- Wirral
Governance
- 29 July 2013: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL LAMBERT MBE | Chair | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev PETER GEORGE MCGRATH | Trustee | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177 | £175 | £0 | £1 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £172 | £636 | £53 | £1.19k | £114 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 15 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 11 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/07/2013
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF LIFE AT SEA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1. TO ERECT A STONE MEMORIAL AT THE MERSEY WATERFRONT TO COMMEMORATE THE FORTY-FOUR PERSONS WHO DIED IN THE MV "DERBYSHIRE" AND TO FURTHER THE AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC TO THE IMPORTANCE OF FORENSICALLY EXAMINING WRECKED VESSELS, NOT JUST TO ASCERTAIN WHY THEY BECAME A CASUALTY, BUT TO SEARCH FOR ANY DEFICIENCY THAT MAY BE HELD BY VESSELS ELSEWHERE, ESPECIALLY THOSE OF A SIMILAR TYPE. THE MEMORIAL WOULD, USING HISTORY'S STATISTICS, SHOW THE ESTIMATED NUMBER OF LIVES PRESERVED THROUGH IMPLEMENTING LESSONS LIFTED FROM THE WRECK OF MV "DERBYSHIRE." THE MEMORIAL WOULD NOT ONLY MOURN LOSS OF LIFE, BUT ALSO CELEBRATE PRESERVATION OF LIFE THROUGH THAT LOSS. 2. TO SUPPORT THE MERSEYSIDE MARITIME MUSEUM IN PRESENTING EXHIBITIONS THAT EDUCATE THE PUBLIC TO THE DIFFERENCE BETWEEN THE DANGERS FACED BY THE SEAFARER IN THE CONTEXT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, AND THOSE POSED BY THE INADEQUACY OF THE MEANS BY WHICH HE/SHE PLIES THE OCEANS. 3. TO STANDARDISE THE QUALITY, MAINTENANCE AND COMPREHENSIVENESS OF DATA AND TO ENSURE THAT INFORMATION IS NOT ILLEGALLY USED FOR OTHER THAN A STRICTLY DEFINED PURPOSE: TO DRAW UP A CODE OF CONDUCT FOR ALL VOYAGE DATA RECORDERS NOW REQUIRED IN MERCHANT SHIPS. 4. TO INVESTIGATE AND RECORD BULK CARRIERS NOT REQUIRED TO HAVE HATCH COVERS TO STANDARD URS21+1 (PRE-2007 BUILD), BECAUSE THE REQUIREMENT FOR BULKERS POST 2007 IMPLIES THAT PRE-2007 COVERS ARE INADEQUATE. ALSO AGE RELATED WEARDOWN OF COVERS TO BE RESEARCHED WITH THE POSSIBILITY OF REDUCING STRESSES BY INCREASING FREEBOARD (I.E.CARRYING LESS). 5. TO LIAISE WITH THE MARITIME REGULATORS, MARITIME EXPERTS (THEORETICAL AND SEAGOING) AND NAVAL ARCHITECTS REGARDING THE IMPLEMENTATION OF THE TWENTY-TWO RECOMMENDATIONS MADE BY THE "DERBYSHIRE RFI." 6. TO ENSURE THAT THERE IS AN INDEPENDENT, TRANSPARENT AND MUTUALLY ACCEPTABLE ROUTE TO FULL AND PROPER CASUALTY INVESTIGATION, AND - RELATED - THAT THE CONFIDENTIAL HAZARDOUS INCIDENT REPORTING SYSTEM IS RE-ESTABLISHED. (CHIRPS).
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 CAVENDISH DRIVE
BIRKENHEAD
CH42 6RG
- Phone:
- 01516457544
- Email:
- petermcgrath@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window