MUSICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Music workshops, mainly for disadvantaged students, funded by grants from various sources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £39,400 from 2 government contract(s) and £22,075 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 11 February 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Mary Shanks | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Nixon | Trustee | 21 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Scoulding | Trustee | 21 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROW | Trustee | 06 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.94k | £22.94k | £65.47k | £107.34k | £97.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.51k | £20.76k | £67.07k | £109.78k | £97.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £39.40k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £22.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 18 April 2025 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 02 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 AUG 2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN AND ADVANCE THE CREATIVE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH PARTICIPATION IN CREATIVE ACTIVITIES, IN PARTICULAR MUSIC, TO IMPROVE THE SELF-ESTEEM WELL BEING AND LIFE CHANCES OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED BY PERSONAL CIRCUMSTANCES SUCH AS DISABILITY , ILL HEALTH, POVERTY OR ISOLATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Wilding Road
IPSWICH
IP8 3SG
- Phone:
- 07899980524
- Email:
- admin@musica-workshops.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window