Financial history AN EXTRA MILE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1150598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £22.36k £68.59k £136.13k £62.63k £94.83k
Total expenditure £26.19k £94.15k £127.02k £70.60k £90.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A