Financial history GREAT LINFORD (ST. ANDREWS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1151367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £30.53k £41.53k £25.20k £22.64k £14.02k
Total expenditure £32.12k £29.21k £25.93k £25.99k £18.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.85k £20.94k £10.67k N/A N/A