THE TIM HETHERINGTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Tim Hetherington Trust mission is to promote the continuation of Tim's vision by promoting the continued use of his work and by supporting new work by other artists. In addition to overseeing current projects the Tim Hetherington Trust will develop a grant programme to encourage the initiation of new work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 May 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH MARY HETHERINGTON | Chair | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM ALISTAIR HETHERINGTON | Trustee | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
PIERS DUNN | Trustee | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.00k | £72.46k | £24.95k | £7.21k | £11.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.15k | £62.96k | £20.89k | £18.65k | £17.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 387 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 387 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 July 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 May 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 June 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 JUN 2012
Charitable objects
PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW FOR THE TIME BEING OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
109 Dene Road
Didsbury
MANCHESTER
M20 2GU
- Phone:
- 01614462914
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window