Financial history ECCLES COMMUNITY HALL ORGANISATION (ECHO)

Charity Number: 1152625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £66.24k £25 £3.58k £15.03k £17.27k
Total expenditure £18.54k £37.10k £10.72k £14.48k £17.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £55.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A