SILVER STREAK RECRUITMENT AND LEARNING LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supported Energy R Us electrcity events with volunteers from the charity. Supported MPA with volunteers for their outreach event for youth , elderly and members of the public Trained volunteers on Promoting Energy Efficiency.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 December 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Brent
- Buckinghamshire
- Ealing
- Hertfordshire
- Luton
Governance
- 01 August 2013: Standard registration
- SSRLA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Parkinson | Trustee | 14 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER BLAKEY SEWELL | Trustee | 04 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/12/2020 | 05/12/2021 | 05/12/2022 | 05/12/2023 | 05/12/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 December 2024 | 12 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 December 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 December 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 December 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 December 2020 | 27 January 2022 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/07/2013
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND THE PROMOTION OF VOLUNTEERING WHERE IT FURTHERS A PURPOSE, FALLING UNDER THE DESCRIPTION OF PURPOSES SET OUT IN S.3 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011 IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF RETIRED PEOPLE AND YOUNG ADULTS OVER 18.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Luxembourg Close
Luton
LU3 3TD
- Phone:
- 07956501555
- Email:
- silverstreakrla@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window