THE PRIMORDIAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our current project ("The Primordial Wisdom Project") has been funded by a benefactor in the USA and is being led by one of the world's leading authorities on the pre-Socratic Greek philosophers. It aims to make the teachings of the pre-Socratics more widely accessible through worldwide research and collaboration with scholars, students, spiritual leaders and seekers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 March 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MARK JAMES OSBORNE | Chair | 05 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Julian Crawford Watson | Trustee | 15 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Gray | Trustee | 26 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.21k | £1 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.34k | £13 | £591 | £2.08k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Mar 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SPIRITUAL AND PHILOSOPHICAL TRADITIONS UNDERLYING WESTERN CIVILIZATION AS EMBODIED ESPECIALLY IN THE TEACHINGS OF THE KEY PRE-SOCRATIC GREEK PHILOSOPHERS AND SPIRITUAL TEACHERS PYTHAGORAS, PARMENIDES AND EMPEDOCLES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 South Road
Twickenham
TW2 5NU
- Phone:
- 0208 977 3791
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window