NOTTINGHAM FOCUS ON WELLBEING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the physical, mental and spiritual wellbeing of the local community via 1-1 counselling, coaching, mentoring and group activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 25 February 2013: CIO registration
- NFOW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Dawson | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alieu Njai | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Twamley | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Morley | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steve Boseley | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.76k | £8.59k | £10.74k | £13.51k | £15.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.69k | £10.30k | £9.49k | £13.49k | £12.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Feb 2013
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEVE MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE 2. SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nottingham Focus On Wellbeing
Denton Green Training Centre
Denton Green
NOTTINGHAM
NG8 6GD
- Phone:
- 01158370559
- Email:
- info@nfow.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window