Financial history CHINESE CHILDREN AND PARENTS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1156405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.48k £15.79k £12.71k £9.46k £10.92k
Total expenditure £21.79k £13.53k £8.93k £14.36k £15.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.98k £5.84k N/A £400