MLD SUPPORT ASSOCIATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have prepared informative leaflets on Metachromatic Leukodystrophy (MLD), to spread awareness of the disease to medical establishments and raise awareness . We have established links with other charitable organisations who can provide complimentary services to families affected by MLD . We are advocates on behalf of affected families and have strong links to specialist centres.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 January 2013: CIO registration
- 13 October 2021: Funds received from 1167544 BUTTERFLY HUGS
- MLD SUPPORT UK (Working name)
- MLD SUPPORT ASSOCIATION UK1 (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Erskine | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Davenport | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Elson | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE IMRIE | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
|||||
TWILA D'CRUZ | Trustee | 28 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
VIVIENNE ELEANOR CLARK | Trustee | 28 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/07/2020 | 24/07/2021 | 24/07/2022 | 24/07/2023 | 24/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.07k | £9.25k | £26.57k | £32.27k | £35.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.54k | £13.41k | £16.68k | £37.02k | £25.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 July 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 July 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 July 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 July 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 July 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON 21/01/2013
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF THE DIAGNOSIS, PROGRESSION, AND TREATMENT FOR ALL FORMS OF METACHROMATIC LEUKODYSTROPHY (M.L.D.). 2. TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS OF A FAMILY MEMBER THROUGH METACHROMATIC LEUKODYSTROPHY (M.L.D.) BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS. 3. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF METACHROMATIC LEUKODYSTROPHY (M.L.D.) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE TO THEIR FAMILIES; AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO BONA FIDE CLINICIANS AND RESEARCH BODIES WHO ARE SEEKING THERAPEUTIC TREATMENT FOR THIS CONDITION.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Need More Time Ltd
35 Marine Terrace
MARGATE
Kent
CT9 1XJ
- Phone:
- 01227372424
- Email:
- admin@MLDSupportUK.org.uk
- Website:
-
MLDSupportUK.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window